THE EATON HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for children who live in reasonable proximity of Eaton House Schools as set out in the Constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 16 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keri Maharaj Mrs | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Montague Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Quincy Kresler | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Segrave | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Tinworth | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Charlotte Henning | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alma Lawrie | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.34k | £52.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £18.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING BURSARIES AND GENERAL EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS, WHERE THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ATTEND WITHOUT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT IN ORDER TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE TO FULLY PARTICIPATE IN AND FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EATON HOUSE THE MANOR
58 CLAPHAM COMMON NORTH SIDE
LONDON
SW4 9RU
- Phone:
- 02079246000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window