Governing document GECKO THEATRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 SEP 2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 AUG 2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JUN 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 JUL 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01 APR 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 APR 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: 2.1.1 ADVANCE THE ARTS THROUGH THE CREATION AND PERFORMANCE OF ARTISTIC WORKS; AND 2.1.2 ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE DELIVERY OF EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS, MASTERCLASSES, AND RESIDENTIAL COURSES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.