Accounts and annual returns ABILITY ACCESS LEGAL

Charity number: 1194061
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 November 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 November 2024 295 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late