SUPPORTING HUMANITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Humanity focuses on some of the most neglected issues in the community: Mental health and Bereavement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL SAVAGER | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sumaiya Khoda | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Idris Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Saeed Musa | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Iqbal Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Yunus Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Zulfikar Ali | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.45k | £109.01k | £183.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £48.45k | £82.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN LONDON BY PROVIDING: GOODS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN LONDON, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT, AND SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 New North Road
Ilford
IG6 2UE
- Phone:
- 07941874477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window