THE AUC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity will support the AUC through providing grants and funding for their research and work in promoting understanding of the Arab world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Egypt
- United States
Governance
- 21 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
M Shafik Gabr | Chair | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hosna Rachid | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sameh Shenouda | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £321.65k | £64.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £11.69k | £53.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2023 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2023 | 381 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HERITAGE AND CULTURE OF THE ARAB WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bates Wells Braithwaite
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- +0226152265
- Email:
- hkasas@aucegypt.edu
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window