THE FRIENDLY FOOD CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout England to promote good health and wellbeing, particularly but not exclusively among those who are economically and socially disadvantaged. Various types of sessions designed to increase understanding and skills in nutrition, healthy eating, cooking, meal planning, growing food and budgeting and raise awareness of the relationship between diet and health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £64,950 from 1 government contract(s) and £85,623 from 7 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 January 2023: Standard registration
- 24 August 2023: Funds received from 1110940 THE TRAINING AND LEARNING COMPANY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Balfe | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victor Itsevhekhai Igbaifua | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rouse | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Stein | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Iain Stevenson | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Read | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £64.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | £85.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 20 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”), TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG THOSE WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES DESIGNED TO INCREASE UNDERSTANDING AND SKILLS IN NUTRITION, HEALTHY EATING, COOKING, MEAL PLANNING, GROWING FOOD AND BUDGETING AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DIET AND HEALTH. 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Townsend Community Centre
Jewell Road
Bournemouth
BH8 0LT
- Phone:
- 01202552419
- Website:
-
thefriendlyfoodclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window