SWANSEA DRUGS PROJECT (SAND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has been dormant throughout the period, due to the incorporation of a new entity, with effect from 1st August 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 08 April 1986: Standard registration
- SAND (Working name)
- SWANSEA ADVICE ON NARCOTICS AND DRUGS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE HOFFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE SCANNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KELVIN BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BOWES EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATY MATHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 1986,11 JUNE 1987 ,21 FEBRUARY 1991 AND 20 JULY 1992, AND 3 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM OR CONCERNED WITH THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS CAUSED THEREBY; ALSO THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF WEST GLAMORGAN.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF WEST GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
73-74 MANSEL STREET
SWANSEA
SA1 5TR
- Phone:
- 01792472002
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window