Accounts and annual returns PUTTALAM COMMUNITY SUPPORT UK

Charity Number: 1194115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 May 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2023 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days