ONE FOR THE WORLD (OFTW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One for the World carries out activities that educate the public about the consequences of extreme poverty and effective solutions to these issues; and raises funds from the public, which the organisation then regrants to highly effective charities working to end extreme poverty, at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joshua McCann | Chair | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Colonel | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharina Schwarz | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.29k | £143.86k | £201.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.39k | £32.81k | £71.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO END EXTREME POVERTY IN THE WORLD. SPECIFICALLY, THE CIO AIMS TO PROVIDE A GRANT-MAKING PLATFORM THROUGH WHICH PHILANTHROPIC DONATIONS ARE AGGREGATED AND EXCLUSIVELY USED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. THE CIO WILL EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE CONSEQUENCES OF EXTREME POVERTY AND EFFECTIVE SOLUTIONS TO THESE ISSUES; AND RAISE FUNDS FROM THE PUBLIC TO MAKE GRANTS TO HIGHLY EFFECTIVE CHARITIES WORKING TO END EXTREME POVERTY AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
One for the World
167-169 Great Portland Street
5th Floor
LONDON
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07763200413
- Email:
- info@1fortheworld.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window