SCHOOL PARTNERSHIPS ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes and develops the best practice found in partnerships between schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom James Marshall Arbuthnott | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KINGSLEY LESTER | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JODH DHESI | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LINDA ROBINSON BA M.Ed | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Leo Winkley | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Butterworth | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Mattin | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.27k | £142.57k | £149.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.24k | £181.21k | £132.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY DEVELOPING SCHOOL PARTNERSHIPS TO DEVELOP THE EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND EMPLOYMENT CAPACITIES, CAPABILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
McCarthy Denning Ltd
70 Mark Lane
LONDON
EC3R 7NQ
- Phone:
- 07879 329446
- Website:
-
schoolpartnershipsalliance.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window