V&C FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1193142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a charity that helps other charities mostly in the Wandsworth area (focusing predominately on children, children's education and families) increasing their marketing and PR reach. With our state-of-art studio in Battersea, we help other charities creating best marketing, PR and social produce digital content such as videos, social media assets, images

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fabio Jesus D'Elia Chair 18 January 2021
None on record
Marco Russo Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Raymond Pountney Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.42k £6.95k £0
Total expenditure £7.42k £6.95k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 201
Avro House
7 Havelock Terrace
LONDON
SW8 4AS
Phone:
07525070118