BEE-LIEVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life young people up to the age of 18 and their families living in but not limited to South East England through the provision of mental health support, social and physical activities & opportunities which develop their resilience, capacities and capabilities, enabling them to participate in society as mature, confident and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 February 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Merideth | Chair | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tindall | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Fields | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Hunter | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison D'Amario | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.65k | £52.41k | £71.65k | £70.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £28.11k | £44.71k | £46.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN BUT NOT LIMITED TO SOUTH EAST ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES & OPPORTUNITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR RESILIENCE, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES, ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE, CONFIDENT AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Oakhill Road
ADDLESTONE
Surrey
KT15 1DH
- Phone:
- 01932846366
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window