Trustees BARE NECESSITIES TOILETRY BANK
Charity Number: 1193427

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Hobson | Chair | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Helen Robinson | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Waugh | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE RUSSELL | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Lambert | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Susan Smith | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abigail Louise Gill | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
BeverlyCarol Heagerty | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.