ALIVE CHURCH DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian faith in the UK, for the benefit of the public, through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, producing and/or distributing literature on the Christian faith, and providing support to smaller churches, or such other means as the trustees determine to enlighten others about the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
Governance
- 12 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inya Nkama | Chair | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shanbir Singh Grewal | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CONNER JAY LYNCH | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Nkama | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anders Landstrom | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07k | £32.92k | £61.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.06k | £33.37k | £56.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SMALLER CHURCHES, OR SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE UK BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/ OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Jackson Avenue
Mickleover
DERBY
DE3 9AU
- Phone:
- 07786470187
- Email:
- alivechurchderby@gmail.com
- Website:
-
alivechurchderby.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window