Equal Arts Ltd.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Equal Arts is the Northern Region's arts & older people's agency. We aim to improve the quality of people's lives in the North East by enabling older people to have access to high quality arts projects. We work in res care homes, hospitals, arts venues & other comm venues & contract professional, experienced artists to facilitate each project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £37,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 1986: Standard registration
- EQUAL ARTS (Working name)
- NORTHERN SHAPE (Previous name)
- T A EQUAL ARTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Walton | Chair | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Beeley | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Connelly | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Lisa Franks | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE MCDERMOTT-SHIELDS | Trustee | 18 April 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £423.31k | £343.25k | £373.78k | £365.43k | £340.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.71k | £262.46k | £313.36k | £325.82k | £396.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.20k | £28.00k | N/A | £37.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.50k | N/A | £22.48k | £36.50k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1989. as amended on 23 Apr 2019 as amended on 18 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING (BY WAY OF EXAMPLE ONLY AND NOT OF LIMITATION) THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, POETRY, LITERATURE, THE GRAPHIC ARTS, SCULPTURE AND DESIGN. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY FACILITIES FOR THERAPEUTIC ENTERTAINMENT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND FOR PHYSICALLY DISABLED OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS OR THOSE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF CUMBRIA, NORTHUMBERLAND, DURHAM, TYNE AND WEAR AND CLEVELAND.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 3
City Library
Charles Avison Building
33 New Bridge Street West
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 8AX
- Phone:
- 01912611619
- Email:
- information@equalarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window