DWELL OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dwell Oxford purchases properties in Oxfordshire to provide accommodation for (a) vulnerable people at risk of homelessness, and (b) Christian workers involved in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 February 2021: Standard registration
- Homes With Purpose (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Martin Peake | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Martin Vellacott Johnson | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Andrew Rowlands | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Colin Farley | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Stuart Waddington | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.35k | £214.95k | £84.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.51k | £70.81k | £56.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN OXFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AND WORLD AS MAY BE DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION (EITHER DIRECTLY OR WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS) FOR THE FOLLOWING PERSONS IN HOUSING NEED 3.1.1 PERSONS ENGAGED IN CHRISTIAN MISSION OR MINISTRY OR OTHER CHRISTIAN WORK; AND 3.1.2 PERSONS IN TRAINING FOR SUCH MINISTRY, MISSION OR WORK; IN EACH CASE BEING PERSONS WHO ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, UNABLE TO FUND SUITABLE HOUSING IN AN APPROPRIATE LOCATION OUT OF THEIR OWN RESOURCES; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN OXFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AND WORLD AS MAY BE DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 OLIVER ROAD
OXFORD
OX4 2JH
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window