LITTLEWORTH READING ROOM & PLAYING FIELD CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing and raising revenue for the purpose of maintaining the Littleworth Reading Room building and land as a community hall facility for the residents of the parish of Littleworth and the Littleworth Playing Field as an area for social events, recreation and exercise for all ages of the Littleworth parish population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Codd | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Radcliffe | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
dr Michael Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leah Caroline Baigel | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.48k | £9.65k | £34.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.38k | £3.54k | £9.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LITTLEWORTH NEAR FARRINGTON SN7 8ED ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE, OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Reading Room
Littleworth
Faringdon
Oxfordshire
SN7 8ED
- Phone:
- 01367240195
- Email:
- ciotrustee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window