BRENCHLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a village hall and recreation ground for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 February 2021: CIO registration
- 29 January 2024: Funds received from 216208 THE BRENCHLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GRO...
- BRENCHLEY WAR MEMORIAL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNNE BUTLER | Chair | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
William James Izzard | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Anderson | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Louis Phillips | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Butler | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Dykes | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WALTON MARSTON | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Grant | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jerome Oliver-Smith | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Norah Churchill | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEVIN JULIAN O'CONNOR | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £40.94k | £52.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £60.91k | £48.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2021 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BRENCHLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AS A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO THE OFFICERS AND MEN BELONGING TO THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO FELL IN THE GREAT WAR OF 1914 TO 1918
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRENCHLEY MEMORIAL HALL
BRENCHLEY ROAD
BRENCHLEY
TONBRIDGE
TN12 7NX
- Phone:
- 01892832579
- Email:
- bmhcbookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window