THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DIATOM RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the biennial International Diatom Symposium Support young scientists through "Young ISDR" to bring the energy of early-career researchers and technicians in diatom research Offer travel funding for registered students in the field to attend relevant scientific conferences of educational merit Publish an international scientific journal - Diatom Research Connect people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Czech Republic
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Guam
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Iran
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Latvia
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Russia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 17 May 2021: CIO registration
- 25 October 2024: Funds received from 1054897 THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DIATOM RESEARCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rebecca Bixby | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonas Zimmermann | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marco Cantonati | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carlos Wetzel | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shinya Sato | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Taylor PhD | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrea Montserrat Burfeid Castellanos | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martyn Kelly | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bart Herman Theresia Gerard Van de Vijver | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ingrid Juettner | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Kahlert | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Spaulding | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosa Trobajo | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEELY JONES | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ALL BRANCHES OF DIATOM STUDIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Wynwood Close
Toton
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 6NA
- Phone:
- 07713175949
- Email:
- kmil@bgs.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window