Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL - WIGGINTON (KNOWN AS WIGGINTON 'OLD SCHOOL')

Charity number: 517365
Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required