GROW TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grow Together provides growing areas and activities for people who have need of such facilities. We relieve poverty by providing food grown in community growing spaces to the local foodbanks. We advance education for the public benefit in the subjects of horticulture, conservation of natural resources and improvement of the environment. For people in Leicester and Leicestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shantilal Narotam Chauhan | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Mary Bell | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Brown | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £409 | £502 | |
|
Total expenditure | £822 | £355 | £429 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING GROWING AREAS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN LEICESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS’. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FOOD GROWN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN A COMMUNITY GARDEN IN LEICESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND GIVEN TO THOSE IN NEED AS SERVICED BY FOOD BANKS AND CHARITIES CONCERNED WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN LEICESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF’. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECTS OF HORTICULTURE, CONSERVATION OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING IN HORTICULTURE AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION’. 4. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY’. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
WYCLIFFE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
THE COMMON
EVINGTON
LEICESTER
LE5 6EA
- Phone:
- 01163191221
- Email:
- contact@growtogether.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window