BEDFORD GREENACRE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity seeks to educate children from Bedford and the surrounding areas and seeks to help those who have special educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£7,066,442
Donations and legacies | £331.40k | |
Charitable activities | £6.73m | |
Other trading activities | £1.79k | |
Investments | £7 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,498,466
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.50m | |
Retained for future use | £567.98k |
People

142 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 13 April 2021: Standard registration
- BEDFORD INDEPENDENT SCHOOL LTD (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD MILLARD | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vinesh Camiah Mr | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Stevenson | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aleksandar Aleksic | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LLOYD CONAWAY | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian Johnson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebeka Goodale | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Braithwaite | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Barker | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Fay | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Williamson | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42m | £7.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53m | £6.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £330.97k | £331.40k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.28k | £1.79k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.08m | £6.73m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £119 | £7 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.51m | £6.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £23.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £74.35k | £83.32k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.25m | £2.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.10m | £774.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JAN 2021 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: 2.1.1 TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE, AT HOME OR ABROAD, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL OR ANY OF ITS BRANCHES IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1.1.1 ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND PROVIDING A BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES AND PROVIDE BOARD RESIDENCE AND ACCOMMODATION OF ALL OR ANY OF THE STUDENTS, MASTERS, MISTRESSES AND OTHER STAFF ATTACHED TO THE SCHOOL. 2.1.1.2 SUPPLYING TO THE STUDENTS OF ANY SCHOOL WITH GENERAL INSTRUCTION OF THE HIGHEST CLASS, TOGETHER WITH PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS TRAINING; 2.1.1.3 OFFERING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, PRIZES AND AWARDS AND TO MAKE GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES TO STUDENTS OR PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS AT ANY SCHOOL CARRIED ON BY THE CHARITY; 2.1.1.4 OFFERING SCHOLARSHIPS AND EXHIBITIONS AND TO MAKE GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES TO ANY STUDENT OR PAST STUDENT OF ANY SCHOOL CARRIED ON BY THE CHARITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROCEEDING TO ANY UNIVERSITY, SCHOOL OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR RESEARCH WORK; 2.1.1.5 MAKING GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES TO ANY PERSON ENGAGED IN THE TEACHING PROFESSION FOR THE PURPOSE OF TRAINING AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2.1.1.6 CARRY ON FARMING, DAIRY AND POULTRY FARMING, STOCK BREEDING, MARKET GARDENING, FRUIT FARMING AND NURSERIES ON ANY PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THOSE AREAS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bedford Greenacre Ind School Ltd
Manton Lane
BEDFORD
BEDFORD
Bedfordshire
MK41 7FZ
- Phone:
- 01234352031
- Email:
- hello@bedfordgreenacre.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window