NAGINA SOCIAL WELFARE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Islamic faith for the benefit of the public in particular, but not exclusively, by: providing a Madrassah for Islamic religious education and classes in Arabic and Urdu; providing relief to those in poverty as a practical expression of the Islamic faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bilal Sajjad | Chair | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Anjum Afzal | Trustee | 27 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Tauseef | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Shamsa Mehmood | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ansar Ali | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tahir Ibrahim | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Imran Khan | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Mehmood | Trustee | 31 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.09k | £30.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £26.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: • PROVIDING A MADRASSAH FOR ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND CLASSES IN ARABIC AND URDU; • PROVIDING RELIEF TO THOSE IN POVERTY AS A PRACTICAL EXPRESSION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 BURMER ROAD
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 3HT
- Phone:
- 07951919325
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window