COUNTER EXTREMISM PROJECT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Wallace | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sir Ivor Anthony Roberts KCMG | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Gordon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jolie Davis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Henley Old | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 2.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECTS OF COUNTER-EXTREMISM, COUNTER-TERRORISM AND RADICALISATION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THOSE SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULT. 2.2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE AND ARMED FORCES IN COUNTER-EXTREMISM AND COUNTER-TERRORISM AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION OF COUNTER-EXTREMISM, COUNTER-TERRORISM AND RADICALISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 STAFFORD STREET
NORWICH
NR2 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01603568288
- Email:
- info@counterextremism.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window