THE CENTRE FOR MAIDENHEAD HERITAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a heritage museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
- AIR TRANSPORT AUXILIARY MUSEUM & ARCHIVE (Working name)
- ATA MUSEUM (Working name)
- MAIDENHEAD HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- MHC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Harry Mellins | Chair | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
James Stewart White | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Poad MBE | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.96k | £45.83k | £35.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.84k | £57.24k | £67.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2024 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2024 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A HERITAGE MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF OBJECTS, DOCUMENTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND OTHER ITEMS CONNECTED WITH THE HISTORY OF MAIDENHEAD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Park Street
Maidenhead
SL6 1SL
- Phone:
- 01628780555
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window