IMMUNODEFICIENCY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of health and the relief of people affected by primary and secondary immunodeficiency and their families by providing assistance, advice or guidance in relation to managing their condition, treatment and quality of life; promoting awareness and understanding of these conditions and to encourage and support research into causes, treatments and prevention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 January 2021: CIO registration
- PRIMARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Brisse-Uhlig | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Taylor | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Anne Brailsford | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Toft | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Shepard | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Diane Hammond | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.45k | £131.27k | £89.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.24k | £116.43k | £112.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY PRIMARY AND SECONDARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PEOPLE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR WELFARE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITATION: (A) BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE, ADVICE OR GUIDANCE IN RELATION TO MANAGING THEIR CONDITION AND IMPROVING THE DIAGNOSIS OF THESE CONDITIONS, THEIR TREATMENT AND THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THOSE AFFECTED; (B) PROMOTING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY WITHIN THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND MEDICAL PROFESSION IN ORDER TO BETTER UNDERSTAND THESE CONDITIONS AND THEIR IMPACT; AND (C) PROVIDING A HELPLINE SERVICE, EVENTS AND PRACTICAL HELP AND ADVICE. (2) TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENTS, PREVENTION AND CURES FOR PRIMARY AND SECONDARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Immunodeficiency UK
C/O Tudor John Accountants
Nightingale House
46-48 East Street
Epsom
KT17 1HQ
- Phone:
- 08009878986
- Email:
- hello@immunodeficiencyuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.