Accounts and annual returns MY TURNING POINT INTERNSHIP, STUDY AND EMPLOYABILITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1194834
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 September 2023 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2024 668 days late Download Open in new window