JALARAM SADAVRAT TRUST LEICESTER UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Food and necessity support for public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 January 2021: Standard registration
- JALARAM SADAVRAT TRUST LEICESTER UK (Working name)
- JALARAM SADAVRAT (LEICESTER) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Praful Bhatt | Chair | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ranjan Kanabar | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vaibhavi Adhvaryu | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.14k | £348.88k | £403.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.31k | £312.24k | £384.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 DEC 2020 as amended on 01 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG THE POOR, THE DISABLED, THE ELDERLY AND PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, TREATMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS FOOD AND OTHER NECESSITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS AND ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEN STREET ROOMS
GLEN STREET
LEICESTER
LE4 6NN
- Phone:
- 07971361449
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window