Accounts and annual returns BETHEL HALL GREEN APOSTOLIC CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1193282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window