FARNHAM COMMUNITY SUPPORT & RESPONSE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSISTING LOCAL COUNCILS, EMERGENCY SERVICES, STATUTORY BODIES AND CATEGORY 1 AND 2 RESPONDERS WITH THEIR EMERGENCY PLANNING, RESPONSE AND RECOVERY ACTIVITIES IN TIMES OF ADVERSE WEATHER OR MAJOR INCIDENT OR IN REMOTE AND POORLY ACCESSIBLE LOCATIONS; AND C) PROVIDING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO LOCAL RESIDENTS, GROUPS AND CHARITIES
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 February 2021: CIO registration
- FCSRG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Blencowe | Chair | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Moran | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Rodger Hieatt | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY IN THE COMMUNITY OF FARNHAM, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMMUNITY EMERGENCY PLANS; B) ASSISTING LOCAL COUNCILS, EMERGENCY SERVICES, STATUTORY BODIES AND CATEGORY 1 AND 2 RESPONDERS WITH THEIR EMERGENCY PLANNING, RESPONSE AND RECOVERY ACTIVITIES IN TIMES OF ADVERSE WEATHER OR MAJOR INCIDENT OR IN REMOTE AND POORLY ACCESSIBLE LOCATIONS; AND C) PROVIDING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO LOCAL RESIDENTS, GROUPS AND CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 ROMAN WAY
FARNHAM
GU9 9RG
- Phone:
- +447918999771
- Email:
- info@fcsrg.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window