DAR UL ULOOM ISLAMIA RIZWIA (BRALAWAI)


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to provide a place of worship, religious teachings, community services and education centre for the benefit of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£521,326
Donations and legacies | £116.52k | |
Charitable activities | £19.07k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £383.87k | |
Other | £1.88k |
Total expenditure:
£864,995
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £865.00k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £865.00k |
People

9 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 18 April 1986: Standard registration
- CJMGS (Working name)
- DAR UL ULOOM ISLAMIA RIZWIZ (BRALAWAI) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Konane | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Jamil Bashir | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Asif Quayum | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zahir Abbas | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
ABDUL KHALIQ | Trustee |
|
||||||
Ahsan Ul Haq | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £427.89k | £283.00k | £367.92k | £293.49k | £521.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.43k | £530.33k | £883.36k | £827.51k | £865.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £116.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £383.87k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.88k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £865.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £124.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £91.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
26 January 2022 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO PROFESS THE FAITH OF DAR UL ULOOM ISLAMIA RIZWIN (BRALAWAI) AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM BY:- (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A SCHOOL AND BY THE PROVISIONS OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES TENABLE AT THE SAID SCHOOL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Jamia Mosque Ghamkol Sharif
150 Golden Hillock Road
Small Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0DX
- Phone:
- 0121 773 7277
- Email:
- Ahsan.ulhaq@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window