BEVERLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We encourage participation in choral singing and provide a learning community of like-minded individuals. We rehearse regularly, perform concerts in a variety of venues and donate a proportion of the proceeds of those concerts to local good causes with the remainder used to cover our costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Albert Newbery | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Musik | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip MacMullen | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.84k | £14.15k | £13.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.29k | £13.09k | £15.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.13k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
2.1. THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, NOT FOR PROFIT, BUT IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. 2.2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Barkers Mill
BEVERLEY
HU17 0UJ
- Phone:
- 01482448300
- Email:
- philmac1952@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window