CONCERTS FOR CARERS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the mental health and wellbeing of NHS workers and carers in the UK, in particular but not exclusively by (a) providing access to free tickets to music events (b) providing grants and financial assistance to charities and organisations which provide access to mental health and wellbeing services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AIDAN WHITEMAN DE BRUNNER | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Peter Lambert | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Laurence Gotkine | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.49k | £166.57k | £80.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.37k | £67.84k | £131.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF NHS WORKERS AND CARERS IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * PROVIDING ACCESS TO FREE TICKETS TO MUSIC EVENTS * PROVIDING GRANTS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE ACCESS TO MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
57A Broadway
Leigh on Sea
Essex
SS9 1PE
- Phone:
- 07769 480415
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window