GRACE & PEACE CHURCH PONTYPOOL

Charity Number: 1194642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preaching and teaching of God's word the Bible. Activities include Sunday morning and evening congregational services,small groups and bespoke programmes. Caring for each other through pastoral visiting and informal networks of care. Serving our local community including schools activities, tiny tunes for toddlers, messy church, food bank, songs in care home for elderly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £140
Total expenditure: £175

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Torfaen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • GRACE & PEACE CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eveleen Ann Kwesiga Chair 02 June 2021
None on record
James Kwesiga Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Derrick Giles Trustee 02 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £314 £140 £140
Total expenditure £310 £175 £175
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 28 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 21 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mount Pleasant Chapel
Hanbury Road
Pontypool
NP4 6LL
Phone:
07539293990