ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN NEWCASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit among people of Ethiopian origin living in Newcastle and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael TARIKU | Chair | 18 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Meseret Habtegiorgis | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zenabe Yesuf | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Senait Abebe Bekru | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE OF ETHIOPIAN ORIGIN LIVING IN NEWCASTLE, AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS; (B) SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Verdun Avenue
HEBBURN
Tyne And Wear
NE31 1QQ
- Phone:
- 07877964611
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window