Markazi Jamia Masjid Ghousia ( Ahle Sunnat Wa Jamaat )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN HALIFAX AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD 2. TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUNNI, HANAFI, BRAILVI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY QURAN, HADITH, FIQH, ISLAMIC LAW AND COMPARATIVE STUDY OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS IN THE WORLD. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 26 January 2021: CIO registration
- 21 October 2022: Funds received from 1155329 MARKAZI JAMIA MASJID GHOUSIA ( AHLE SUNNAT WA JAMM...
- MARKAZI JAMIA MASJID GHOUSIA ( AHLE SUNNAT WA JAMMAT) HALIFAX (Previous name)
- MARKAZI JAMIA MASJID GHOUSIA(AHLE SUNNAT WA JAMMAT) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD SAJAWAL | Chair | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aksar Ali | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
BasHir Ahmed | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD AYUB | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAJID MAHMOOD | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.11k | £107.34k | £94.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.52k | £86.10k | £67.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2021 as amended on 15 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE HOLY PROPHET MUHAMMAD (SALLALLAHU ÆALAYHI WA AÆLI HE WA SALLAM). 2. TO PROMOTE AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND OPERATING EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUNNI, HANAFI, BARELVI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY QURAN, HADITH, FIQH, ISLAMIC LAW AND COMPARATIVE STUDY OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS IN THE WORLD. 3. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 RHODES STREET
HALIFAX
WEST YORKSHIRE
HX1 5DE
- Phone:
- 01422330041
- Email:
- help@lindley-adams.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window