SMALLSHAW HURST COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Smallshaw Hurst Community Action Group runs a Pantry Store in Cedar Park, Ashton Under Lyne to support the local community of Hurst, Hurst Cross and Smallshaw with the aim of reducing food poverty and waste. Importantly, the Pantry also aim to be a safe place for members to build friendships, and find help and mutual support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Chesterton | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE STRETTON | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dinesh Chauhan | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Renkin | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Susanne Swindells | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Matley | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.36k | £26.00k | £33.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.18k | £29.09k | £29.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.05k | £5.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF LOW INCOME FAMILIES IN SMALLSHAW HURST AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD BY THE OPERATION OF A COMMUNITY PANTRY STORE FOOD SCHEME.
Area of benefit
SMALLSHAW HURST AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashton United Football Club
Surrey Street
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL6 8DY
- Phone:
- 07523919185
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window