TOV

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations and provide building for club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Belgium
- Canada
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 08 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIMELECH GRATT | Chair | 10 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Yakov Padwa | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonah Tunk | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.05k | £64.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.07k | £33.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 27 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 27 November 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MEANS OF GRANTS TO SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, AND EDUCATIONAL CLUBS 3. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 FAIRHOLT ROAD
LONDON
N16 5EW
- Phone:
- 07423702957
- Email:
- Elimelech@gratt.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window