RIDING MILL DRAMA CLUB

Charity number: 1193734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public performances of plays, as well as workshops and play readings. These activities are carried out in community spaces in Riding Mill. Play readings have been carried out online at times when covid restrictions applied.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £12,347
Total expenditure: £11,099

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Nicholas Tortice Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Jean Margaret Buckley Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Angela Routledge Trustee 25 November 2020
USEFUL VISION
Received: On time
Kristian Leif Andersen Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Helen Mason Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/03/2022 08/03/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £509 £1.86k £12.35k
Total expenditure £532 £811 £11.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 March 2023 17 January 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2023 17 January 2024 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dene House
Millfield Road
Riding Mill
Northumberland
NE44 6DW
Phone:
07813818311