Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE CIO

Charity Number: 1193190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window