Trustees NORFOLK LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE CIO
Charity number: 1193190

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Vanstone | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gay | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Crocker | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Louise Hooker | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Chedgey | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bainger | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.