TAWE PICKLEBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Ystradgynlais and the surrounding areas through the provision of facilities for the playing of pickleball
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
- Powys
Governance
- 15 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Stacey | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael John | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hammond-Williams | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £10.55k | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.68k | £10.00k | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 17 October 2024 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 17 October 2024 | 230 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YSTRADGYNLAIS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF PICKLEBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Swansea Road
Pontardawe
SWANSEA
SA8 4AL
- Phone:
- 07801 539010
- Email:
- dhwhome@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window