KARIS' HELPING HAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities main aim is the relief and prevention of poverty helping to support venerable members of society get back on their feet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART HARRY JENKINS | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE STUART HARRY DARKIN | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN WILLIAM MCMONAGLE | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MCMONAGLE MRS | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA KATHLEEN MCMONAGLE MRS | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £11.03k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52 | £882 | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 16, DIAGNOSED WITH BRAIN TUMORS, AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES THROUGHOUT THE SOUTH-EAST OF ENGLAND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF: GRANTS/GIFTS; MEMORY MAKING DAYS OUT, AND; HELP TOWARDS EVERYDAY ESSENTIALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 HAWKESBURY ROAD
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 0EY
- Phone:
- 07422725682
- Website:
-
karishelpinghand.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window