NEW MILTON MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of local people from the town of New Milton and the surrounding parishes and we operate a Mens Shed, which is a community space for men to connect, convers, and create. Members come together to share skills, knowledge, and experiences in order to enrich each other's lives. This is achieved by undertaking creative and practical projects and using the shed as a social networking hub.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,491 from 8 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Derek Hughes | Chair | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Storer | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwin John Healey | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hawtin | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £64.10k | £31.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £5.04k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.00k | £3.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF NEW MILTON MEN'S SHED ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING THOSE AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN THE POSTAL CODE OF BH25 AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; BEREAVEMENT; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH ACTIVE PARTICIPATION AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RELEVANT HEALTH ORGANISATIONS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF GOOD HEALTH STRATEGIES.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE POSTAL CODE OF BH25 AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Milton Mens Shed
Fawcetts Field Sports Ground
Christchurch Road
NEW MILTON
Hampshire
BH25 6QF
- Phone:
- 07387292976
- Email:
- newmiltonmensshed@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window