M7 EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide workshops, activities and educational programs to those from an under privileged or disadvantaged background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Minter | Chair | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Borovick | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Minter | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silvanna Quy | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £85.17k | £120.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £76.84k | £90.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN ENGLAND & WALES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 REDHOOD WAY WEST
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
HERTS
SG6 6DD
- Phone:
- 07503733908
- Email:
- nickminter@m7e.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window