Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE APOSTOLIC CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1193596
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 02 February 2025 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 02 February 2025 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 July 2024 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 13 July 2024 226 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 03 December 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 10 April 2023 131 days late Download Open in new window