NEW LIFE APOSTOLIC CHURCH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Church that preaches the Gospel of Jesus Christ and demonstrate the love of Christ through social outreaches that empower and support people in the community whether they are Christian or not. We offer services like free tuition for KS2, KS3 and KS4 students. We also provide Music Tuition, Youth counselling, mentoring and look forward to start drama training and working with food banks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Albert Taku | Chair | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Joseph | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Yitsir | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £3.94k | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.53k | £7.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 July 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 July 2024 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 December 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND PRACTICES IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITY WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
454A High Road
1st Floor
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07723618775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window