SURREY SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Surrey Search & Rescue is a voluntary specialist search team that assists the emergency services to find missing vulnerable adults and children. We are on-call 24 hours a day, with a team of 80 plus people and search dogs, to respond across Surrey and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 May 2021: CIO registration
- 02 August 2022: Funds received from 1144329 SURREY SEARCH AND RESCUE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cameron Prentice | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Dibbens | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monique Stephens | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Marten | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Linale | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Drapper | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hitchinson | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.00k | £52.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.95k | £63.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2024 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2024 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES BY: 1) THE PROVISION OF SEARCH AND RESCUE RESOURCES TO AND IN PARTNERSHIP WITH EMERGENCY SERVICES AND OTHER STATUTORY BODIES OR THIRD PARTIES, IN LINE WITH THE UK SEARCH AND RESCUE FRAMEWORK OR OTHER APPROPRIATE GUIDANCE OR REGULATION; (2) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND ADVICE TO SUCH PARTNERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO SEARCH AND RESCUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Surrey Search & Rescue
15a Monument Way East
WOKING
GU21 5LY
- Phone:
- 01483347180
- Email:
- info@surreysar.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window