LEEDS BEREAVEMENT FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leeds Bereavement Forum works to develop and improve bereavement services in Leeds by providing information, training and forums for bereavement professionals and to identify gaps in services and work with others to meet these needs. Set up in 1996, Leeds Bereavement Forum has three part-time staff who organize and manage the work, the Directory and web Directory.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £42,772 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 29 April 2021: CIO registration
- 13 February 2023: Funds received from 1093311 LEEDS BEREAVEMENT FORUM
- 09 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1058706 CARERS LEEDS
- 09 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1007625 LEEDS MIND
- 09 December 2024: Funds transferred to 701285 THE MARKET PLACE (LEEDS)
- 09 December 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £88.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £59.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL MATTERS RELATED TO BEREAVEMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING WITH THE OBJECT OF RELIEVING THE SUFFERING OF THOSE AFFECTED BY DEATH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window