HOH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of essential services to the vulnerable in England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 February 2021: CIO registration
- HAND ON HEART (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Komeil Alibai | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Afzal Pradhan | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Riyaz Husein Dhalla | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.02k | £302.56k | £312.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.37k | £273.24k | £273.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HoH Charitable Trust
Chaplin House
Widewater Place
Moorhall Road
Harefield
UB9 6NS
- Phone:
- 07956805328
- Email:
- admin@handonhearttrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window